Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Cattaraugus County, NY, . Cattaraugus County, NY Superior Courts with HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON. MICHAEL L. NENNO Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management34 days |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2015 |
||
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationCattaraugus County, NY |
||
Case Cycle Time751 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2016 | Hearing |
PRE-SETTLED NENNO (Court Activity) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
June 22, 2016 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #002) NENNO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
June 22, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) NENNO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
June 22, 2016 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE CATTARAUGUS COU (Prelim. Conference) Judge: THE CATTARAUGUS COUNTY CENTER, 1701 LINC |
|
June 17, 2016 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE CATTARAUGUS COU (Prelim. Conference) Judge: THE CATTARAUGUS COUNTY CENTER, 1701 LINC |
|
June 02, 2016 | Motion |
MOTION TO STRIKE (Motion #002) Decided: 06/22/2016WITHDRAWN AS CASE HAS SETTLED Before Justice: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
June 02, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #002) NENNO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
May 18, 2016 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE CATTARAUGUS COU (Prelim. Conference) Judge: THE CATTARAUGUS COUNTY CENTER, 1701 LINC |
|
May 06, 2016 | Hearing |
NOTE OF ISSUE FILED NENNO (Court Activity) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
April 08, 2016 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE CATTARAUGUS COU (Prelim. Conference) Judge: THE CATTARAUGUS COUNTY CENTER, 1701 LINC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.