Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Cattaraugus County, NY, . Cattaraugus County, NY Superior Courts with HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON. MICHAEL L. NENNO Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2016 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCattaraugus County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time671 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 28, 2016 | Hearing |
PRE-DISCONTINUED NENNO (Court Activity) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
January 11, 2016 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NENNO (Prelim. Conference) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
December 14, 2015 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NENNO (Prelim. Conference) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
November 13, 2015 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NENNO (Prelim. Conference) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
November 12, 2015 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NENNO (Prelim. Conference) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
August 14, 2015 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NENNO (Prelim. Conference) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
June 03, 2015 | Motion |
DECISION RE:MOTION... DENIED (Motion #003) Decided: 06/03/2015GRANTED SIGNED AND DECISION TO Before Justice: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
June 03, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #003) NENNO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
June 03, 2015 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #003) NENNO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
June 03, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #003) NENNO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.