Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Cattaraugus County, NY, . Cattaraugus County, NY Superior Courts with HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON. MICHAEL L. NENNO Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2014 |
CategoryRes. Foreclosure Conf Eligible |
Last RefreshedSeptember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCattaraugus County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time30 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2014 | Hearing |
PRE-SETTLED NENNO (Court Activity) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
September 17, 2014 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) NENNO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
September 17, 2014 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #002) NENNO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
September 17, 2014 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) NENNO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
September 14, 2014 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) NENNO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
September 10, 2014 | Motion |
ORDER TO DISCONTINUE ACTION AN (Motion #001) Decided: 09/17/2014GRANTED & SIGNED;TO ATTY 9/18 Before Justice: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
September 10, 2014 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) NENNO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
September 04, 2014 | Hearing |
NENNO (Settlement Conference)
Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
September 04, 2014 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #005) NENNO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
September 04, 2014 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #006) NENNO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.