Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Other Torts case in the jurisdiction of Cattaraugus County, NY, . Cattaraugus County, NY Superior Courts with HON. PAULA L. FEROLETO presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON. PAULA L. FEROLETO Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management43 days |
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2020 |
CategoryOther Torts |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationCattaraugus County, NY |
||
Case Cycle Time2032 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2020 | Motion |
JUDGMENT (Motion #007) Decided: 06/03/2020GRANTED AND SIGNED BY JUDGE FE Before Justice: HON. PAULA L. FEROLETO Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. PAULA L. FEROLETO |
|
June 03, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #007) FEROLETO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. PAULA L. FEROLETO |
|
June 03, 2020 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #007) FEROLETO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. PAULA L. FEROLETO |
|
June 03, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #007) FEROLETO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. PAULA L. FEROLETO |
|
March 06, 2020 | Motion |
ORDER SIGNED BY PLF (Motion #006) Decided: 03/06/2020GRANTED SIGNED AND ORDER SENT Before Justice: HON. PAULA L. FEROLETO Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. PAULA L. FEROLETO |
|
March 06, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #006) FEROLETO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. PAULA L. FEROLETO |
|
March 06, 2020 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #006) FEROLETO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. PAULA L. FEROLETO |
|
March 06, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #006) FEROLETO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. PAULA L. FEROLETO |
|
March 06, 2020 | Hearing |
PRE-SETTLED FEROLETO (Court Activity) Judge: HON. PAULA L. FEROLETO |
|
January 23, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #005) FEROLETO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. PAULA L. FEROLETO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.