Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Cattaraugus County, NY, . Cattaraugus County, NY Superior Courts with HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON. MICHAEL L. NENNO Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 10, 2014 |
CategoryContested Matrimonial |
Last RefreshedSeptember 26, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationCattaraugus County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Cycle Time406 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2015 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #003) NENNO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
March 23, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #003) NENNO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
March 23, 2015 | Hearing |
PRE-SETTLED NENNO (Court Activity) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
March 16, 2015 | Motion |
JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (Motion #003) Decided: 03/23/2015GRANTED BY MLN PAPERS RETURNED Before Justice: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
March 16, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #003) NENNO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
September 15, 2014 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE CATTARAUGUS COU (Prelim. Conference) Judge: THE CATTARAUGUS COUNTY CENTER, 1701 LINC |
|
July 24, 2014 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) NENNO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
July 23, 2014 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) NENNO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
July 21, 2014 | Motion |
ORDER RELEASTING ATTORNEY PETE (Motion #001) Decided: 07/24/2014GRANTED SIGNED AND ORDER TO AT Before Justice: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
July 21, 2014 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) NENNO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.