Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Cattaraugus County, NY, . Cattaraugus County, NY Superior Courts with THE CATTARAUGUS COUNTY CENTER, LITTLE VA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTHE CATTARAUGUS COUNTY CENTER, LITTLE VA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 21, 2015 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationCattaraugus County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time315 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2015 | Hearing |
PRE-SETTLED FEROLETO (Court Activity) Judge: HON. PAULA L. FEROLETO |
|
January 21, 2015 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) FEROLETO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. PAULA L. FEROLETO |
|
January 21, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) FEROLETO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. PAULA L. FEROLETO |
|
December 26, 2014 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) FEROLETO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. PAULA L. FEROLETO |
|
December 26, 2014 | Motion |
FINAL JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (Motion #001) Decided: 01/21/2015GRANTED & SIGNED;HANDED DIRECT Before Justice: HON. PAULA L. FEROLETO Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. PAULA L. FEROLETO |
|
December 11, 2014 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE FEROLETO (Prelim. Conference) Judge: HON. PAULA L. FEROLETO |
|
December 04, 2014 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE FEROLETO (Prelim. Conference) Judge: HON. PAULA L. FEROLETO |
|
November 21, 2014 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE FEROLETO (Prelim. Conference) Held Judge: HON. PAULA L. FEROLETO |
|
November 06, 2014 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE FEROLETO (Prelim. Conference) Held Judge: HON. PAULA L. FEROLETO |
|
September 22, 2014 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE FEROLETO (Prelim. Conference) Held Judge: HON. PAULA L. FEROLETO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.