Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Cattaraugus County, NY, . Cattaraugus County, NY Superior Courts with HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON. MICHAEL L. NENNO Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2015 |
CategoryRes. Foreclosure Conf Eligible |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCattaraugus County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time413 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2015 | Hearing |
NENNO (Settlement Conference)
Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
April 22, 2015 | Hearing |
PRE-DISCONTINUED NENNO (Court Activity) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
February 04, 2015 | Hearing |
NENNO (Settlement Conference)
Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
December 03, 2014 | Hearing |
NENNO (Settlement Conference)
Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
October 01, 2014 | Hearing |
NENNO (Settlement Conference)
Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
March 05, 2014 | Hearing |
DEFAULT NENNO (Settlement Conference) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
March 05, 2014 | Hearing |
NENNO (Settlement Conference)
Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.