Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Cattaraugus County, NY, . Cattaraugus County, NY Superior Courts with HON. PAULA L. FEROLETO presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON. PAULA L. FEROLETO Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 13, 2014 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCattaraugus County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time55 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2014 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE FEROLETO (Prelim. Conference) Judge: HON. PAULA L. FEROLETO |
|
May 07, 2014 | Hearing |
PRE-SETTLED FEROLETO (Court Activity) Judge: HON. PAULA L. FEROLETO |
|
May 01, 2014 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE FEROLETO (Prelim. Conference) Judge: HON. PAULA L. FEROLETO |
|
April 03, 2014 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE FEROLETO (Prelim. Conference) Judge: HON. PAULA L. FEROLETO |
|
March 13, 2014 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE FEROLETO (Prelim. Conference) Judge: HON. PAULA L. FEROLETO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.