Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Cattaraugus County, NY, . Cattaraugus County, NY Superior Courts with HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHON. MICHAEL L. NENNO Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 06, 2014 |
CategoryRes. Foreclosure Conf Eligible |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCattaraugus County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time76 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 23, 2014 | Hearing |
PRE-SETTLED NENNO (Court Activity) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
April 23, 2014 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) NENNO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
April 21, 2014 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #002) NENNO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
April 10, 2014 | Motion |
JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE (Motion #002) Decided: 04/23/2014GRANTED & SIGNED;TO ATTY 4/23 Before Justice: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
April 10, 2014 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #002) NENNO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
March 05, 2014 | Hearing |
DEFAULT NENNO (Settlement Conference) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
March 05, 2014 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) NENNO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
March 05, 2014 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) NENNO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
February 06, 2014 | Motion |
ORDER OF REFERENCE; ATTY ADELS (Motion #001) Decided: 03/05/2014GRANTED SIGNED AND PAPERS TO A Before Justice: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
|
February 06, 2014 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) NENNO (Motion Part) Judge: HON. MICHAEL L. NENNO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.