Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
John Sj Doe, John Sm Doe, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Boren, Taylor William, Dowling, Ainsley Catherine, Rovner, Nicolas James, Steigman, Jerrold Louis, against Binghamton-Broome County Ymca, Broome County Ymca Foundation, Linnaeus W. West Elementary School, Tyrell Sinclair, Union-Endicott Central School District, (total of 5) See All represented by Campbell, Karen Loreece, Facciponte, Giancarlo, Miller, Frank William, Murphy, Thomas John, Shulman, Corey Lee, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Broome County, NY, . Broome County, NY Superior Courts with Jeffrey Tait presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey Tait Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 02, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroome County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
COURT NOTICE
Date: September 15, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: October 13, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: October 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2023 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance with Prejudice |
||
October 23, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
August 23, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
January 24, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Notice to Produce Medical Records |
||
November 30, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
November 22, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
November 22, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
November 07, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for Authorizations |
||
October 20, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
September 30, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.