Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Td Bank Usa, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Amy Glann, in the jurisdiction of Broome County, NY, . Broome County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroome County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 23, 2021STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: January 11, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 27, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2023 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
January 11, 2022 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
October 08, 2021 | 20 DAY LETTER | ||
September 27, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 27, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 23, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.