Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Scully, James Paul, against John Kliment, in the jurisdiction of Broome County, NY, . Broome County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 18, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroome County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 18, 202120 DAY LETTER
Date: October 08, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: March 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 27, 2023 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
March 15, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
March 14, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY AFFIRMATION |
||
March 14, 2022 | AFFIRMATION OF NON EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | ||
March 14, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF PURCHASE AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT SELLER | ||
March 14, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF | ||
March 14, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 INVOICE FOR SERVICE |
||
March 14, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT |
||
March 14, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR |
||
March 14, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.