Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Security Mutual Life Insurance Company Of New York, filed a(n) General Insurance - Insurance case represented by Luntz, David Todd, against Arie Dov Fried, Basi Schwartz, Fried Devorah, Shlomo Schwartz, in the jurisdiction of Broome County, NY, . Broome County, NY Superior Courts with Oliver N Blaise Iii presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOliver N Blaise Iii Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Insurance |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationBroome County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Insurance |
COMPLAINT
Date: June 09, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: May 06, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 03, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 13, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 28, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: May 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2a)
Date: March 25, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 30, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: March 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 30, 2021RJI: UNASSIGNED
Date: September 14, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 16, 2021NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: December 30, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 20, 2021ANSWER
Date: July 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: June 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: June 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 30, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: April 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2a)
Date: March 25, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: December 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2a) Beneficiary Designation
Date: March 25, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: April 13, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 29, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 18, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 03, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2a) Answer
Date: March 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2a)
Date: March 25, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: October 19, 2021NOTICE
Date: January 05, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2a)
Date: March 25, 2022SUMMONS
Date: June 09, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: September 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2a)
Date: March 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2a)
Date: March 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2a)
Date: March 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 30, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #2a)
Date: March 25, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 29, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: November 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 09, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: June 09, 2021NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #2a)
Date: March 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: December 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
May 06, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
April 21, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
April 13, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
April 13, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
April 07, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
March 25, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2a) Assignment |
||
March 25, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) for NYSCEF Doc Nos. 35-45 |
||
March 25, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2a) Certificate of Death |
||
March 25, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2a) Beneficiary Designation Beneficiary Designation Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.