Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Susan Foster, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Fiedler, Duane M., against Andrew Lerrick Md, United Health Services Hospitals, Inc. D B A Uhs Wilson Medical Center, United Health Services, Inc. D B A Uhs Wilson Medical Center, represented by Monserrate, Michele Marie, Salkin, Justin Lance, in the jurisdiction of Broome County, NY, . Broome County, NY Superior Courts with Jeffrey Tait presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey Tait Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroome County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 09, 2021ANSWER
Date: June 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 28, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2023 | STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
April 13, 2023 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | ||
July 20, 2021 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE |
||
July 15, 2021 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE | ||
July 15, 2021 | NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE | ||
July 15, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
June 30, 2021 | ANSWER | ||
June 30, 2021 |
ANSWER United Health Services, Inc. d/b/a UHS Wilson Medical Center |
||
June 30, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS United Health Services, Inc. d/b/a UHS Wilson Medical Center |
||
June 28, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of ser,Larrick, United Health Services |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.