Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Jefferson Capital Systems, Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Damsky, Edward Jay, Florio, Michael James, Garbus, Mark A, Leiderman, Joel D, against Leann Islar, in the jurisdiction of Broome County, NY, . Broome County, NY Superior Courts with Oliver N Blaise Iii presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOliver N Blaise Iii Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 02, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroome County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 02, 202120 DAY LETTER
Date: July 28, 2021AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 02, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted |
||
December 02, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
December 02, 2022 |
JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
December 02, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILITARY Redacted |
||
December 02, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
||
September 29, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) For an Order Granting Default Judgment |
||
September 29, 2022 |
PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing |
||
September 27, 2022 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
September 08, 2022 |
PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing |
||
September 08, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE WITH ON SUBMISSION MOTION DETAILS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.