Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Midland Credit Management, Inc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Slamowitz, Mitchell G, against Andrew Crawford, in the jurisdiction of Broome County, NY, . Broome County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 26, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBroome County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 26, 2021AFFIDAVIT *Corrected*
Date: September 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
September 28, 2021 | JUDGMENT | ||
September 24, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT *Corrected* SIGNED NON-SOL |
||
September 24, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION *Corrected* SIGNED PJTAFF |
||
September 24, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AOF |
||
September 24, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A CLIENT STATEMENTS |
||
September 24, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION MILITARY |
||
September 24, 2021 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected* SIGNED DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
||
July 29, 2021 | 20 DAY LETTER | ||
June 23, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.