Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Denise E Riley, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Abbott, Rachel Ann, against Travis G Riley, in the jurisdiction of Broome County, NY, . Broome County, NY Superior Courts with Rita Connerton presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRita Connerton Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBroome County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2021 |
FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW Sensitive |
||
April 20, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
April 05, 2021 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
March 30, 2021 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
March 29, 2021 | MATRIMONIAL ADDENDUM (840M) | ||
March 29, 2021 | RJI -RE: UNCONTESTED MATRIMONIAL ACTION | ||
March 29, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | ||
March 29, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSIONS OF LAW (PROPOSED) | ||
March 29, 2021 | AFFIRMATION (AFFIDAVIT) OF REGULARITY | ||
March 29, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.