Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Aaron Johnson, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Bottar, Michael A., Ryder, Aaron J., against Amira Hussein , M.D., Clifford Schwartz , M.D., Colleen Magai , R.P.A., Dale Fluegel , N.P., Eileen Young , R.P.A., (total of 26) See All represented by Cooper, Adam Hill, Darrow, Jessica Lynne, Debraccio, Steven Vincent, Diliberto, Andreanna Marion, Dolan, Mark J, (total of 19) See All in the jurisdiction of Broome County, NY, . Broome County, NY Superior Courts Broome County Supreme Court with Oliver N Blaise Iii presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOliver N Blaise Iii Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 25, 2016 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroome County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseBroome County Supreme Court |
ANSWER
Date: April 11, 2017ANSWER
Date: April 11, 2017DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: April 11, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Letter Decision and Order signed 11/22/22 |
||
November 15, 2022 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT LETTER |
||
November 03, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 03, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
November 02, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
November 02, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
November 01, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 01, 2022 | Affidavit of Service | ||
November 01, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Amended |
||
November 01, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.