Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Broome County, NY, . Broome County, NY Superior Courts with Lebous, Hon. Ferris D. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLebous, Hon. Ferris D. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2015 |
CategoryTort-Medical, Dental, Or Podiatric Malpractice |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBroome County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Case Cycle Time300 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 18, 2015 | Hearing |
Decided Lebous (Court Activity) Judge: Lebous, Hon. Ferris D. |
|
June 10, 2015 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #006) Lebous (Motion Part) Judge: Lebous, Hon. Ferris D. |
|
May 15, 2015 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #0010) Lebous (Motion Part) Judge: Lebous, Hon. Ferris D. |
|
May 15, 2015 | Hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #0010) Lebous (Motion Part) Judge: Lebous, Hon. Ferris D. |
|
May 11, 2015 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #007) Lebous (Motion Part) Judge: Lebous, Hon. Ferris D. |
|
March 20, 2015 | Motion |
(Motion #0010) Decided: 05/15/2015Decided Before Justice: Lebous, Hon. Ferris D. Answer demanded: No Judge: Lebous, Hon. Ferris D. |
|
March 20, 2015 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #0010) Lebous (Motion Part) Judge: Lebous, Hon. Ferris D. |
|
January 09, 2015 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #009) Lebous (Motion Part) Judge: Lebous, Hon. Ferris D. |
|
December 18, 2014 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #008) Lebous (Motion Part) Judge: Lebous, Hon. Ferris D. |
|
December 12, 2014 | Hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #009) Lebous (Motion Part) Judge: Lebous, Hon. Ferris D. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.