Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case in the jurisdiction of Broome County, NY, . Broome County, NY Superior Courts with Tait, Hon. Jeffrey A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTait, Hon. Jeffrey A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 23, 2014 |
CategoryRp-Mortgage Foreclosure-Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBroome County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time501 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2015 | Hearing |
Tait, JSC (Settlement Conference)
Judge: Tait, Hon. Jeffrey A. |
|
October 29, 2014 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Tait, JSC (Motion Part) Judge: Tait, Hon. Jeffrey A. |
|
October 29, 2014 | Hearing |
Pre-Judgment Tait, JSC (Court Activity) Judge: Tait, Hon. Jeffrey A. |
|
October 24, 2014 | Hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #002) Tait, JSC (Motion Part) Judge: Tait, Hon. Jeffrey A. |
|
September 02, 2014 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #002) Tait, JSC (Motion Part) Judge: Tait, Hon. Jeffrey A. |
|
September 02, 2014 | Motion |
(Motion #002) Decided: 10/29/2014Decided Before Justice: Tait, Hon. Jeffrey A. Answer demanded: No Judge: Tait, Hon. Jeffrey A. |
|
June 19, 2014 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Tait, JSC (Motion Part) Judge: Tait, Hon. Jeffrey A. |
|
June 06, 2014 | Hearing |
Return/Submit (Motion #001) Tait, JSC (Motion Part) Judge: Tait, Hon. Jeffrey A. |
|
April 23, 2014 | Hearing |
Motion Filed (Motion #001) Tait, JSC (Motion Part) Judge: Tait, Hon. Jeffrey A. |
|
April 23, 2014 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 06/19/2014Decided Before Justice: Tait, Hon. Jeffrey A. Answer demanded: No Judge: Tait, Hon. Jeffrey A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.