Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
477 Willis Ave Llc, Mark Sonnenschein, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Rosen, Gary S, Rosen, Jaime Danielle, Rosen, Jared Michael, against 1986-F&S Of New York Ltd, New York Deferred Exchange Corporation, represented by Davidson, Harris William, Pensabene, Michael A, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County, NY, . Bronx County, NY Superior Courts with Fidel Gomez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFidel Gomez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 03, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Other (Specific Performance) |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 04, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #4) Assigned contract of sale from former Defendant 1986-F&S of New York, Ltd. to Defendant New York Def Assigned contract of sale from former Defendant 1986-F&S of New York, Ltd. to Defendant New York Def ... show more |
||
January 28, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
January 28, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #4) Assignment of contract from former Defendant 1986-F&S of New York, Ltd. to Defendant New York Deferr Assignment of contract from former Defendant 1986-F&S of New York, Ltd. to Defendant New York Deferr ... show more |
||
January 25, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
December 07, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | ||
December 02, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
December 01, 2022 |
ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST (Motion #3) APPLICATION TO ADJOURN MOTION SEQUENCE 3 OR DENY ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION SEQUENCE 4 |
||
December 01, 2022 |
ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION - OPPOSITION TO REQUEST (Motion #4) OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' REQUEST TO ADJOURN MOTION SEQUENCE # 4 |
||
November 30, 2022 | ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST | ||
November 28, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #3) Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.