Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Teasoro, Inc., Dba Born Juice, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Sobro Development Corporation, South Bronx Overall Economic Development Corporation, represented by Brett, Matthew Samuel, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County, NY, . Bronx County, NY Superior Courts with Veronica G. Hummel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVeronica G. Hummel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 07, 2021COURT NOTICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 03, 2023NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: October 30, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 02, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 02, 2023ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: June 12, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: May 30, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 13, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 21, 2021ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 04, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: October 01, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: August 03, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 21, 2021NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: November 19, 2021NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: October 15, 2021RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #1) *Corrected*
Date: September 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2023 |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #2) OSC Signed as of 11/16/2023 |
||
November 03, 2023 |
COURT NOTICE (Motion #2) Filing on Behalf of - Chambers of Hon. Veronica G. Hummel, A.J.S.C. |
||
November 02, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2) | ||
November 02, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2) | ||
October 30, 2023 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT Mandatory in-person appearance required on11/3/2023 |
||
June 12, 2023 | ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) | ||
May 30, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
April 04, 2023 |
ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #1) Dated 4/3/2023 |
||
August 03, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
November 19, 2021 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT -Per Direction of the Court. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.