Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
1853 Victor Street Ii, Inc., Samera N. Al Owmari , Derivatively On Behalf Of, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Geffner, Alisa Jill, Yaniv, Daniel, against 1853 Victor Street Ii, Inc., Mustafa S. Ali, represented by Bradley, Adam T., Riley, Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County, NY, . Bronx County, NY Superior Courts with Veronica G. Hummel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVeronica G. Hummel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Business Entity |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 03, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: February 22, 2022ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: April 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2023 |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING DATED 4/24/2023 |
||
March 03, 2022 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Notice of Appearance |
||
February 22, 2022 |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Consent to Change Attorney |
||
February 22, 2022 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT Discovery Part Rules / Forms |
||
February 12, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
December 31, 2021 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION | ||
December 31, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR: demand for discovery and inspection |
||
November 15, 2021 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION | ||
November 11, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR: demand for discovery and inspection |
||
November 09, 2021 | ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.