Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Michael Magro, Michael Magro Living Trust, Moira Magro , Or Their Successors In Trust, As Trustees, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Molina, Victor Jose, against 3168 East Tremont Avenue Llc, John Doe #1 And John Doe #2,, New York City Department Of Finance, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County, NY, . Bronx County, NY Superior Courts with Fidel Gomez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFidel Gomez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D1
Date: March 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
March 07, 2023 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE | ||
January 24, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 24, 2023 |
ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE PC Order may be filled out in Lieu of appearance as per Part Rules |
||
June 02, 2022 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT Discovery Part Rules / Forms |
||
April 22, 2022 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
April 11, 2022 | ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIMS of Defendant | ||
March 16, 2022 | STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER | ||
March 15, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D1 Defendants Exh. 1- Contract of Sale |
||
March 15, 2022 | ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.