We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Olivia Penn V. Jimmy Isaac, Picture Car Services, Ltd, Ethel Coaxum

Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago

Olivia Penn, filed a(n) Torts - Automobile case represented by Elefterakis, Nicholas, Newman, Mark T, Tobias, Oliver Roderick, against Ethel Coaxum, Jimmy Isaac, Picture Car Services, Ltd, represented by El Arnaouty, Daniel, Faust, Randy S, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County, NY, . Bronx County, NY Superior Courts .

Case Details

Filing Date

June 24, 2022

Last Refreshed

August 14, 2022

Filing Location

Bronx County, NY

Category

Torts - Motor Vehicle

Practice Area

Automobile

Matter Type

Torts

Case Documents

DEMAND FOR:

Date: August 11, 2022

DEMAND FOR:

Date: August 05, 2022

DEMAND FOR:

Date: August 01, 2022

Case Events

Type Description
DEMAND FOR:
Initial Demands- To replace Document #8
DEMAND FOR:
Insurance
DEMAND FOR:
Initial Demands
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) *Corrected*
Answer with Cross Claim as to E. Coaxum
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
See all events