Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Erica King, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Pollack, Jeffrey Robert, against City Of New York, Manhattan And Bronx Surface Transit Operating Authority, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, Mta Bus Company, New York City Transit Authority, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Bronx County, NY, . Bronx County, NY Superior Courts with Mitchell J Danziger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMitchell J Danziger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 11, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) *Corrected*
Date: November 10, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 10, 2022 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) *Corrected* Notice of Appearance |
||
November 10, 2022 |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Consent to Change Attorney |
||
July 19, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
July 14, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
July 14, 2022 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
March 08, 2022 |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING Dated 3/8/2022 |
||
December 08, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
December 08, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 08, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
September 30, 2021 | ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.