Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Jawad Ur Rehman, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Mastrodomenico, Donald, against Keyana Nate Scott, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County, NY, . Bronx County, NY Superior Courts with Lorraine Martinez Ross presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLorraine Martinez Ross Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 10, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - TO COURT | ||
September 01, 2021 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | ||
September 01, 2021 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
July 12, 2021 | CERTIFICATE OF DISSOLUTION | ||
June 25, 2021 | COMPLAINT | ||
June 25, 2021 | NOTE OF ISSUE | ||
June 25, 2021 | RJI -RE: UNCONTESTED MATRIMONIAL ACTION | ||
June 25, 2021 | CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) | ||
June 25, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENDANT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.