Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Maria De Bobadilla Massiel, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Schneider, Paul Bryan, against David Felizvalentine, Edward R Rodriguez, Steven E Rodriguez, represented by Keats, Andrew Abram, Mcevoy, John Philip, Moskovits, Ronit Z, Webster, Annmarie Elaine, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County, NY, . Bronx County, NY Superior Courts with Bianka Perez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBianka Perez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 09, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 28, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND NOTICE OF EXPERT WITNESS |
||
February 27, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
February 18, 2023 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS 2nd Supplemental BP |
||
February 18, 2023 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS Supplemental BP |
||
February 18, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
January 16, 2023 | Response to Demand for Disclosure 1-6-23 - Felizvalentine | ||
January 06, 2023 | Response to Demand for Disclosure - Felizvalentine | ||
December 28, 2022 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS Supplemental BP |
||
December 22, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND 3101d Expert Witness Disclosure |
||
November 11, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCOVERY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.