Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Daisy Guzman, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Amato, Ryan John, Elefterakis, Nicholas, Magill, Melissa Nicole, against City Of New York, New York City Department Of Citywide Administrative Services, New York City Police Department, New York Department Of Transportation, represented by Counsel, Corporation, Parker, William, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County, NY, . Bronx County, NY Superior Courts with Mitchell J Danziger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMitchell J Danziger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Premises) |
Last RefreshedOctober 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 22, 2022ANSWER
Date: July 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2023 |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Dated 7/31/2023 |
||
January 25, 2023 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Dated: 1/17/23 |
||
June 02, 2022 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 5/31/2022 |
||
May 19, 2022 | STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
May 03, 2022 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION | ||
April 22, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Verified Answer |
||
April 22, 2022 | AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH | ||
April 22, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
April 22, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Verified Bill of Particulars |
||
April 22, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Plaintiff's Demands |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.