Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Crystal Ramos, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Wollerstein, Neil David, against Christin Bezares Police Officer, Christin Bezares Police Officer, City Of New York, John Doe Police Officer, John Roe Police Officer, (total of 7) See All represented by , Steinberg, Russell Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County, NY, . Bronx County, NY Superior Courts with Mitchell J Danziger presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMitchell J Danziger Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (False Arrest) |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 20, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
March 15, 2023 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | ||
March 01, 2022 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Dated 2/23/2022 |
||
March 01, 2022 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
February 24, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCOVERY ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
September 24, 2021 |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED 9/22/2021 |
||
September 22, 2021 |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING Dated September 22, 2021 |
||
September 21, 2021 | STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
September 14, 2021 |
ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #001) DATED 9/9/2021 |
||
August 30, 2021 | STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.