Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Halidou Omarou, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mcmahon, Gregory C, against Abdrahamane Kande, Erick Alexa Rodriguez-Castillo, Oscar A Munoz Ramirez, Peter Paez Jr, represented by Garone, Peter D, Mulle, Richard C, Peknic, Brian M, Troisi, Gary A, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County, NY, . Bronx County, NY Superior Courts with Ben Barbato presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBen Barbato Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 09, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 19, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: September 01, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 13, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 13, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: December 21, 2021ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: January 06, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 15, 2021SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: September 05, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 21, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 15, 2021ANSWER
Date: November 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 14, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 29, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 15, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: October 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 14, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
September 05, 2023 | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
September 01, 2023 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
January 13, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 13, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
January 06, 2022 |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING Dated January 6, 2022 |
||
December 21, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
December 21, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
December 15, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 15, 2021 |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) answer and demands |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.