Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jashawn Burt, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Sardelli, Jonathan Joseph, Sorce, Joseph Michael, against Harlorn, Llc, Western Beef Retail,Inc. D B A Western Beef, Western Beef Retail,Inc. D B A Western Beef, represented by Kretz, Walter A., Steinberg, Jason Scott, Suba, Vincent A, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County, NY, . Bronx County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premise Liability) |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 09, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: August 18, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for Authorizations |
||
April 04, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: DEMAND FOR AUTHORIZATIONS |
||
January 26, 2023 | Affidavit of Service | ||
January 26, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EXAMINING EXPERT - Charla Fischer, MD |
||
January 26, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EXAMINING EXPERT - Dr. Ronald Grelsamer, MD |
||
February 03, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: Supplemental Notice of Discovery and Inspection |
||
November 16, 2021 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
||
October 29, 2021 |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer with Cross-Claims |
||
October 29, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
October 19, 2021 |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.