Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Doe J.C., filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Ellis, Daniel George, Herman, Jeffrey Marc, Rossman, Jenny Rebecca, against Archdiocese Of New York, Our Lady Of Mount Carmel Church, Our Lady Of Mount Carmel School, represented by Filiberti, Joanne, Lampert, Matthew Adam, Ross, Kenneth Scott, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County, NY, . Bronx County, NY Superior Courts with Marissa Soto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarissa Soto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: June 09, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: June 09, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 09, 2021RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: June 09, 2021ANSWER
Date: August 16, 2021STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 19, 2023NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: March 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S)
Date: August 12, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 03, 2023ORDER - AMENDED
Date: July 10, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 18, 2021ORDER - AMENDED
Date: June 15, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: August 16, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 18, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: May 03, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 18, 2021ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: June 14, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 28, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: August 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S)
Date: August 12, 2021ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: August 17, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 18, 2021ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: June 14, 2021SUMMONS
Date: June 09, 2021ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: June 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2023 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
||
May 03, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
May 03, 2023 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
March 19, 2023 |
NOTIFICATION FROM COURT Compliance Conference Order Timeline |
||
July 10, 2022 |
ORDER - AMENDED Second Amended Confidentiality Order July 6, 2022. |
||
September 28, 2021 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER & DECISION/ ORDER DATED 9/23/2021 |
||
August 18, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
August 18, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 17, 2021 |
ANSWER (AMENDED) Amended Answer to Complaint |
||
August 16, 2021 | ANSWER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.