Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Barbara Sierra, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Gentile, Anthony P, Stillman, Jeffrey Scott, against 180Th Street Venture, Cleaners Express, Crotona Center Corp., Crotona Center Corp. A K A Procida Northwest Bronx, represented by Hoffman, Barry M, Matlin, William S., Sestito, Maria, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County, NY, . Bronx County, NY Superior Courts with Doris Gonzalez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDoris Gonzalez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 07, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Trip And Fall) |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: October 23, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: October 23, 2020DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 01, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2022 |
NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL (Motion #4) Notice of Cross-Appeal |
||
August 12, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #4) Affidavit of Service (Notice of Cross-Appeal) |
||
July 27, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
July 27, 2022 | INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT | ||
July 27, 2022 |
NOTICE OF APPEAL (Motion #5) *Corrected* Notice of Appeal and Proof of Service |
||
July 19, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
July 15, 2022 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #5) DATED 7/11/2022 |
||
July 15, 2022 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #4) DATED 7/11/2022 |
||
April 14, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #4) Affidavit of Service (Aff in Reply to Plaintiff) |
||
April 14, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #4) Affidavit of Service (Aff in Reply to Def. Crotona) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.