Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Jose Martinez, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Gorayeb, Christopher J., Moskowitz, Martin Joel, against Gem Parking Corp., Provo Parking Llc, St. Barnabas Hospital, represented by Corgan, John J, Heller, David M, Magee, Patrick C, Rothman, Barry, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County, NY, . Bronx County, NY Superior Courts with Doris Gonzalez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDoris Gonzalez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
STIPULATION AND CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: September 07, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 14, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: September 07, 2021NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: September 14, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 14, 2021COUNTY CLERK MINUTES - PRIOR TO CONVERSION (SUBSEQUENT)
Date: September 07, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: December 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #4)
Date: December 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #4)
Date: December 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #4)
Date: December 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #4)
Date: December 08, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: February 07, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - KK Â (Motion #4)
Date: March 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - X Â (Motion #4)
Date: December 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #4)
Date: December 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - BB Â (Motion #4)
Date: March 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - CC Â (Motion #4)
Date: March 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - II Â (Motion #4)
Date: March 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - JJ Â (Motion #4)
Date: March 17, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: January 07, 2022RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: March 18, 2022CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: July 13, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: March 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - AA Â (Motion #4)
Date: March 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #4)
Date: March 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #4)
Date: March 17, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #4)
Date: March 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Z Â (Motion #4)
Date: March 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #4)
Date: December 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #4)
Date: March 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - GG Â (Motion #4)
Date: March 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - FF Â (Motion #4)
Date: March 17, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: April 22, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - EE Â (Motion #4)
Date: March 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - DD Â (Motion #4)
Date: March 17, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: December 11, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #4)
Date: March 31, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: March 18, 2022ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT Â (Motion #4)
Date: April 18, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - HH Â (Motion #4)
Date: March 17, 2022CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: February 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2023 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
July 13, 2022 |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) Consent to Change Attorney |
||
April 22, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
April 18, 2022 |
ORDER - SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Motion #4) SHORT FORM ORDER & DECISION/ORDER DATED 4/14/2022 |
||
March 31, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #4) Affirmation in Reply to Plaintiffs Opposition |
||
March 31, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #4) Affirmation in Reply to St. Barnabas Opposition |
||
March 18, 2022 | RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS | ||
March 18, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
March 18, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
March 17, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - KK (Motion #4) Affidavit of Hani Nashid |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.