Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Miriam Olivieri, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Santucci, Fred Thomas, against Buenaventura Guzman, Jasmine Caccavelli-Garcia, Victor E. Martinez-Garcia A K A Victor E. Garcia Martinez, represented by Russell, Ellen Matowik, Vicario, Michael A., in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts Bronx County Supreme Court with Mary Ann Brigantti presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMary Ann Brigantti Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 12, 2017 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseBronx County Supreme Court |
STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)
Date: August 06, 2018DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: September 03, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: September 18, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER Dated 1/28/2020 |
|
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED 10/29/2019 |
|
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) SHORT FORM ORDER & ORDER DATED 8/13/2019 |
|
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) | |
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #002) | |
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) DISCOVERY ORDER |
|
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) RETURNED LETTERS AND DATABASE SEARCH |
|
August 06, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002) | |
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.