Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Bronx County, NY, . Bronx County, NY Superior Courts with ShawnDya L. Simpson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShawnDya L. Simpson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2016 |
CategoryTort-Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Cycle Time1393 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 26, 2019 | Hearing |
IA17
Judge: Simpson, Hon. ShawnDya L. |
|
November 26, 2019 | Hearing |
OTHER FINAL DISP. PRE-NOTE IA17 Judge: SHAWNDYA L. SIMPSON |
|
June 24, 2016 | Hearing |
IA Part 2 Supreme Initial (first time on); XMOT GRANTED 6/24/16 (Conversion) Judge: Taylor, Hon. Elizabeth A. |
|
June 24, 2016 | Hearing |
DISPOSED/RESULT OF MOTION IA PART 2 XMOT GRANTED 6/24/16 Judge: ELIZABETH A. TAYLOR |
|
March 02, 2016 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) Submission Motions-Room 217 02 (Conversion) Judge: Taylor, Hon. Elizabeth A. |
|
March 02, 2016 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #001) SUBMISSION MOTIONS-ROOM 217 Judge: ELIZABETH A. TAYLOR |
|
February 02, 2016 | Motion |
Judgment - Default (Motion #001) Decided: 06/24/2016Denied Before Justice: Taylor, Hon. Elizabeth A. Answer demanded: No Judge: Taylor, Hon. Elizabeth A. |
|
February 02, 2016 | Motion |
DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #001) Decided: 06/24/2016MOTION DENIED Before Justice: ELIZABETH A. TAYLOR Answer demanded: No Judge: ELIZABETH A. TAYLOR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.