Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Bronx County, NY, . Bronx County, NY Superior Courts with Alison Y. Tuitt presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlison Y. Tuitt Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2015 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 14, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time223 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED-OPEN APPEARANCE (Motion #001) MOTIONS 27 Judge: JULIA RODRIGUEZ |
|
October 06, 2015 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) MOTIONS 27 2:30PM Judge: JULIA RODRIGUEZ |
|
October 01, 2015 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) MOTIONS 27 2:30PM Judge: JULIA RODRIGUEZ |
|
September 17, 2015 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) MOTIONS 27 ROOM 217 Judge: ALISON Y. TUITT |
|
September 04, 2015 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) IA MOTION 5 ROOM 217 Judge: ALISON Y. TUITT |
|
September 02, 2015 | Motion |
TEMP RESTRAINING ORDER (Motion #001) Decided: 04/12/2016CASE DISPOSED Before Justice: JULIA RODRIGUEZ Answer demanded: No Judge: JULIA RODRIGUEZ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.