Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Rite Aid Corporation, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Jacobson, Robert L, against The Commission Of Finance Of The City Of New York, The Tax Commission Of The City Of New York, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County, NY, . Bronx County, NY Superior Courts Bronx County Supreme Court with Adrian N Armstrong presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAdrian N Armstrong Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 13, 2015 |
CategoryTax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
Filing Court HouseBronx County Supreme Court |
PETITION
Date: October 13, 2015NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 13, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 29, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2021 | Hearing |
Tax Certiorari Part CHRE (Conversion) Judge: Armstrong, Hon. Adrian N. |
|
December 14, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned IA Part 21 VIRT. CONF. (Conversion) Judge: Armstrong, Hon. Adrian N. |
|
December 14, 2020 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD IA PART 21 VIRT. CONF. Judge: ADRIAN N. ARMSTRONG |
|
October 19, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned Tax Certiorari Part ADMIN ADJ (Conversion) Judge: Certiorari Judge, Tax |
|
October 19, 2020 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) IA Motion 21 ADMIN ADJ (Conversion) Judge: Armstrong, Hon. Adrian N. |
|
October 19, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED TAX CERTIORARI PART ADMIN ADJ Judge: TAX CERTIORARI JUDGE |
|
October 19, 2020 | Hearing |
FULLY SUBMITTED (Motion #001) IA MOTION 21 ADMIN ADJ Judge: ADRIAN N. ARMSTRONG |
|
June 15, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned Tax Certiorari Part Judge: Barbato, Hon. Ben R. |
|
June 15, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) IA Motion 21 ADMIN (Conversion) Judge: Barbato, Hon. Ben R. |
|
June 15, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED TAX CERTIORARI PART Judge: HON. BEN R. BARBATO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.