We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Southern Boulevard Partne V. The Tax Commission Of The City Of New York, And The Commissioner Of Finance Of The City Of New York

Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago

Southern Boulevard Partne, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Resnick, Steven Ellis, against The Tax Commission Of The City Of New York, And The Commissioner Of Finance Of The City Of New York, represented by The Tax Commission Of The City Of New York, in the jurisdiction of Bronx County. This case was filed in Bronx County Superior Courts Bronx County Supreme Court with Howard Silver presiding.

Case Details for Southern Boulevard Partne v. The Tax Commission Of The City Of New York, And The Commissioner Of Finance Of The City Of New York

Filing Date

October 14, 2005

Category

Tax Certiorari

Last Refreshed

February 22, 2021

Practice Area

Tax

Filing Location

Bronx County, NY

Matter Type

Assessment Challenge

Filing Court House

Bronx County Supreme Court

Case Outcome Type

Disposed

Case Cycle Time

1183 days

Parties for Southern Boulevard Partne v. The Tax Commission Of The City Of New York, And The Commissioner Of Finance Of The City Of New York

Plaintiffs

Southern Boulevard Partne

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Resnick, Steven Ellis

Defendants

The Tax Commission Of The City Of New York, And The Commissioner Of Finance Of The City Of New York

Attorneys for Defendants

The Tax Commission Of The City Of New York

Case Documents for Southern Boulevard Partne v. The Tax Commission Of The City Of New York, And The Commissioner Of Finance Of The City Of New York

Case Events for Southern Boulevard Partne v. The Tax Commission Of The City Of New York, And The Commissioner Of Finance Of The City Of New York

Type Description
Docket Event RJI -RE: OTHER(SPECIFY IN DESCRIPTION AREA)
N/I 05 BX 2720/57 & 63
Docket Event Note of Issue w/ RJI previously paid (Fee required - 30.00)
N/I 05 BX/2720/57 & 63
Docket Event TAX CERTIORARI PETITION -COMPUTER GENERATED
See all events

Related Content in Bronx County

Case

Carlos Abreu v. Migdalia Matos, Amanda Sierra
Jul 11, 2024 | Commercial - Contract | Commercial - Contract | 810995/2024E

Case

Stephen Natera on behalf of himself, Stephen Natera on behalf of all other persons similarly situated v. Issm Protective Services Inc.
Jul 09, 2024 | Commercial - Other (Class Action) | Commercial - Other (Class Action) | 810858/2024E

Case

North Mill Credit Trust v. 21 Divicion Wc Corp., Wander Casilla
Jul 09, 2024 | Commercial - Contract | Commercial - Contract | 810835/2024E

Case

Mya Torres v. Liza Rieger, John Rieger
Jul 09, 2024 | Torts - Motor Vehicle | Torts - Motor Vehicle | 810829/2024E

Case

Doundley Edwards v. Geico Indemnity Company
Jul 12, 2024 | Torts - Motor Vehicle | Torts - Motor Vehicle | 2790/2023E

Case

Arthur M Mchugh Jr v. Deborah Mchugh
Jan 12, 2021 | Mary Lynn Dlabola | Matrimonial - Uncontested | Matrimonial - Uncontested | 800514/2021E

Case

Neveia Nahalia Bird v. New Bronx Car & Limosine, Mohammad I Malik, Cheikh I Tall
Jul 10, 2024 | Torts - Motor Vehicle | Torts - Motor Vehicle | 810874/2024E

Case

Eucaris Hernandez v. Bx9 Bsp Llp, Livingston Management Services, Llc
Jul 10, 2024 | Torts - Other (PREMISES) | Torts - Other (PREMISES) | 810889/2024E

Case

Ida Garcia v. Abm Industries, Inc., Abm Industry Groups, Llc, The Port Authority Of New York And New Jersey
Jul 10, 2024 | Torts - Other Negligence (Premises municipal) | Torts - Other Negligence (Premises municipal) | 810905/2024E

Case

In The Matter Of The Application For An Order Staying The Arbitration Between Hereford Insurance Company v. Maxime M Momoti
Jul 09, 2024 | Special Proceedings - CPLR Article 75 | Special Proceedings - CPLR Article 75 | 810824/2024E

Case

Brainel Yunieth Mata Buroz v. Tahereh Naeimi, John Doe (name being fictitious and unknown)
Jul 09, 2024 | Torts - Motor Vehicle | Torts - Motor Vehicle | 810802/2024E

Case

Ncb Management Services Inc v. Angel Hernandez
Jul 10, 2024 | Other Matters - Contract - Other | Other Matters - Contract - Other | 810890/2024E

Document

Maria Giampietro v. Lafayette Nominee Owner, Llc
Jul 11, 2024 | Torts - Other (trip and fall) | Torts - Other (trip and fall) | 810991/2024E

Document

In The Matter Of The Application For An Order Staying The Arbitration Between Hereford Insurance Company v. Maxime M Momoti
Jul 09, 2024 | Special Proceedings - CPLR Article 75 | Special Proceedings - CPLR Article 75 | 810824/2024E

Document

Yorbi Diaz v. City Of New York, New York City Department Of Sanitation, Jose Ocasio
Jul 12, 2024 | Torts - Motor Vehicle | Torts - Motor Vehicle | 811063/2024E

Document

Workers' Compensation Board Of The State Of New York v. Nile Convenience Store Corp
Jul 11, 2024 | Other Matters - Workers Comp App for Judgment | Other Matters - Workers Comp App for Judgment | 500443/2024E

Document

Candy Pereyra, Juan Moscoso v. Gilberto Diaz, W&M Brother Transport Inc., Fernando Deleon
Jul 10, 2024 | Torts - Motor Vehicle | Torts - Motor Vehicle | 810896/2024E

Document

Workers' Compensation Board Of The State Of New York v. Bro Transporting Llc
Jul 04, 2024 | Other Matters - Workers Comp App for Judgment | Other Matters - Workers Comp App for Judgment | 500407/2024E

Document

Jaime Steinberg v. Alia Razzaq in her capacity as Chief Clerk of the Civil Court of the City of New York
Jul 08, 2024 | Myrna Socorro | Special Proceedings - CPLR Article 78 | Special Proceedings - CPLR Article 78 | 810798/2024E