Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Bronx County, NY, . Bronx County, NY Superior Courts with Howard H. Sherman presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHoward H. Sherman Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management250 days |
Filing DateAugust 16, 2018 |
CategoryTort-Other Negligence |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 15, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2021 | Hearing |
Stat. Conf. Cal. Call Room 707
Judge: Danziger, Hon. Mitchell J. |
|
April 19, 2021 | Hearing |
Adjourned Stat. Conf. Cal. Call Room 707 Judge: Danziger, Hon. Mitchell J. |
|
April 19, 2021 | Hearing |
STAT. CONF. CAL. CALL ROOM 707
Judge: MITCHELL J. DANZIGER - CITY |
|
January 27, 2021 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #002) Submission Motions-Room 217 DUMMY, E#002 (Conversion) Judge: Rodriguez, Hon. Julia I. |
|
December 30, 2020 | Motion |
Consolidate (Motion #002) Decided: 03/30/2021Granted Before Justice: Rodriguez, Hon. Julia I. Answer demanded: No Judge: Rodriguez, Hon. Julia I. |
|
December 07, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned Stat. Conf. Cal. Call Room 707 Judge: Danziger, Hon. Mitchell J. |
|
December 07, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED STAT. CONF. CAL. CALL ROOM 707 Judge: MITCHELL J. DANZIGER - CITY |
|
July 27, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned Stat. Conf. Cal. Call Room 707 Judge: Danziger, Hon. Mitchell J. |
|
July 27, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED STAT. CONF. CAL. CALL ROOM 707 Judge: MITCHELL J. DANZIGER - CITY |
|
March 02, 2020 | Hearing |
Held Stat Conf Cal Room 707 - 2Pm Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Danziger, Hon. Mitchell J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.