Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Bronx County, NY, . Bronx County, NY Superior Courts with JULIA RODRIGUEZ presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJULIA RODRIGUEZ Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management23 days |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2016 |
CategoryE-Filed Motor Vehicle |
Time To Trial1511 days |
Last RefreshedSeptember 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationBronx County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
VerdictDefendant |
Case Cycle Time1521 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2018 | Hearing |
VERDICT FOR DEFENDANT IA27 Judge: JULIA RODRIGUEZ |
|
April 25, 2018 | Hearing |
CASE ON TRIAL IA27 Judge: JULIA RODRIGUEZ |
|
April 24, 2018 | Hearing |
CASE ON TRIAL IA27 Judge: JULIA RODRIGUEZ |
|
April 20, 2018 | Hearing |
CASE ON TRIAL IA27 Judge: JULIA RODRIGUEZ |
|
April 19, 2018 | Hearing |
CASE ON TRIAL IA27 OPNGS Judge: JULIA RODRIGUEZ |
|
April 17, 2018 | Hearing |
REFERRED TO ANOTHER JUDGE SPECIAL TRIAL PART ROOM 607 IA-27 Judge: DORIS M. GONZALEZ - STP |
|
April 16, 2018 | Hearing |
JURY SELECT SPECIAL TRIAL PART ROOM 607 Judge: DORIS M. GONZALEZ - STP |
|
April 10, 2018 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED SPECIAL TRIAL PART ROOM 607 Judge: DORIS M. GONZALEZ - STP |
|
March 12, 2018 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED SPECIAL TRIAL PART ROOM 607 Judge: DORIS M. GONZALEZ - STP |
|
January 25, 2018 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED SPECIAL TRIAL PART ROOM 607 Judge: DORIS M. GONZALEZ - STP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.