Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Goldman Sachs Bank Usa, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Jackling, Joseph M, Jakas, Joseph Karl, Verhagen, Jason Peter, against Robyn Sanders, in the jurisdiction of Albany County, NY, . Albany County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationAlbany County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 03, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2022 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
July 05, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 05, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 29, 2021 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
October 29, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 20, 2021 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
September 20, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - ROBYN SANDERS |
||
September 20, 2021 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHO FORM |
||
September 03, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 03, 2021 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.