Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Herc Rentals, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Marinstein, Edward R., against Camille Gibeau, Individually As Copartners And D B A Build Green Sips A K A Buildgreen Sips, Richard Stone Individually As Copartners And D B A Build Green Sips A K A Buildgreen Sips, in the jurisdiction of Albany County, NY, . Albany County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationAlbany County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 03, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: September 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2022 | Affidavit of Mailing | ||
September 15, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 12, 2022 |
JUDGMENT entered by clerk |
||
September 09, 2022 | Affirmation of Attorney (Non-Military) (Richard Stone) | ||
September 09, 2022 | Affidavit of Claim | ||
September 09, 2022 | Affidavit of Mailing of a Copy of the Summons and Verified Complaint (Richard Stone) | ||
September 09, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) (1) Richard Stone Individually as Copartner and d/b/a Build Green Sips a/k/a BuildGreen Sips and (2) (1) Richard Stone Individually as Copartner and d/b/a Build Green Sips a/k/a BuildGreen Sips and (2) ... show more |
||
September 09, 2022 | Affidavit of Mailing of a Copy of the Summons and Verified Complaint and Notice of Service (LLC) | ||
January 03, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Richard Stone (SSAVC) |
||
November 17, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Camille Gibeau (SSAVC) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.