Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Niagara Mohawk Power Corporation D B A National Grid, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Aron, Joshua Isaiah, Solomon, Julie B., against Walter G. Jones Jr., in the jurisdiction of Albany County, NY, . Albany County, NY Superior Courts with Kimberly A O'Connor presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKimberly A O'Connor Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Property Damage) |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlbany County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 01, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Summons, Complaint and Affidavit of Service |
||
June 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Affidavit of Plaintiff |
||
June 05, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
June 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Military Affidavit |
||
June 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Additional Notice |
||
June 05, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
June 05, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
June 05, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 22, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
June 13, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.