Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Falasco, Todd C, Femminella, Nicole P, against John Doe #1 Through John Doe #10, The Last Ten Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To The Plaintiff, The Person Or Parties Intended Being The Persons Or Parties, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises Described In The Complaint, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #10, The Last Ten Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To The Plaintiff, The Person Or Parties Intended Being The Persons Or Parties, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises Described In The Complaint, Sherri J. Brooks, in the jurisdiction of Albany County. This case was filed in Albany County Superior Courts with Kimberly A. O'Connor presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKimberly A. O'Connor Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 27, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAlbany County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time162 days |
John Doe #1 Through John Doe #10, The Last Ten Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To The Plaintiff, The Person Or Parties Intended Being The Persons Or Parties, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises Described In The Complaint
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Certificate of Merit Attached Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 27, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 16, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 01, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2016 | Hearing |
PRE-DISCONTINUED O'CONNOR (Court Activity) Judge: KIMBERLY A. O'CONNOR |
|
September 23, 2016 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 23, 2016 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
September 23, 2016 | CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS | ||
September 08, 2016 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED order-signed by clerk |
||
August 25, 2016 | Hearing |
CASE NOT SETTLED O'CONNOR (Settlement Conference) Judge: KIMBERLY A. O'CONNOR |
|
June 09, 2016 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
June 09, 2016 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
June 09, 2016 | CERTIFICATE OF MERIT | ||
June 09, 2016 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.