Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case in the jurisdiction of Albany County, NY, . Albany County, NY Superior Courts with CHRISTOPHER J. MCCARTHY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCHRISTOPHER J. MCCARTHY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management28 days |
Filing DateApril 15, 2016 |
CategoryArticle 78 |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
|
Filing LocationAlbany County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
|
Case Cycle Time237 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2016 | Hearing |
PRE-DISMISSED MCCARTHY (Court Activity) Judge: CHRISTOPHER J. MCCARTHY |
|
December 08, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) MCCARTHY (Motion Part) Judge: CHRISTOPHER J. MCCARTHY |
|
September 27, 2016 | Hearing |
HEARING HELD MCCARTHY (Hearing) Judge: CHRISTOPHER J. MCCARTHY |
|
July 22, 2016 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) MCCARTHY (Motion Part) Judge: CHRISTOPHER J. MCCARTHY |
|
May 13, 2016 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE MCCARTHY (Prelim. Conference) Judge: CHRISTOPHER J. MCCARTHY |
|
May 13, 2016 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) FERREIRA (Motion Part) Judge: JAMES H. FERREIRA |
|
April 15, 2016 | Motion |
Declaratory Judgment (Motion #001) Decided: 12/08/2016DISMISSED Before Justice: CHRISTOPHER J. MCCARTHY Answer demanded: No Judge: CHRISTOPHER J. MCCARTHY |
|
April 15, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) MCCARTHY (Motion Part) Judge: CHRISTOPHER J. MCCARTHY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.