Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Other case in the jurisdiction of Albany County, NY, . Albany County, NY Superior Courts with MICHAEL H. MELKONIAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMICHAEL H. MELKONIAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 11, 2016 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationAlbany County, NY |
|
Case Cycle Time28 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2016 | Hearing |
PRE-DECIDED MELKONIAN (Court Activity) Judge: MICHAEL H. MELKONIAN |
|
April 08, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) MELKONIAN (Motion Part) Judge: MICHAEL H. MELKONIAN |
|
April 04, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) MELKONIAN (Motion Part) Judge: MICHAEL H. MELKONIAN |
|
March 11, 2016 | Motion |
Poor Person (Motion #001) Decided: 04/04/2016DENIED Before Justice: MICHAEL H. MELKONIAN Answer demanded: No Judge: MICHAEL H. MELKONIAN |
|
March 11, 2016 | Motion |
Name Change (Motion #002) Decided: 04/08/2016DENIED Before Justice: MICHAEL H. MELKONIAN Answer demanded: No Judge: MICHAEL H. MELKONIAN |
|
March 11, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #002) MELKONIAN (Motion Part) Judge: MICHAEL H. MELKONIAN |
|
March 11, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) MELKONIAN (Motion Part) Judge: MICHAEL H. MELKONIAN |
|
March 11, 2016 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #002) MELKONIAN (Motion Part) Judge: MICHAEL H. MELKONIAN |
|
March 11, 2016 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) MELKONIAN (Motion Part) Judge: MICHAEL H. MELKONIAN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.