Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case in the jurisdiction of Albany County, NY, . Albany County, NY Superior Courts with DEBRA J. YOUNG presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDEBRA J. YOUNG Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 29, 2019 |
CategoryArticle 78 |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationAlbany County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
Case Cycle Time38 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2020 | Hearing |
PRE-WITHDRAWN YOUNG (Court Activity) Judge: DEBRA J. YOUNG |
|
January 06, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) YOUNG (Motion Part) Judge: DEBRA J. YOUNG |
|
January 06, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) YOUNG (Motion Part) Judge: DEBRA J. YOUNG |
|
December 27, 2019 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) BRESLIN (Motion Part) Judge: THOMAS A. BRESLIN |
|
December 27, 2019 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #002) BRESLIN (Motion Part) Judge: THOMAS A. BRESLIN |
|
December 20, 2019 | Motion |
Dismiss Petition (Motion #002) Decided: 01/06/2020WITHDRAWN - PER LETTER FROM PE Before Justice: DEBRA J. YOUNG Answer demanded: No Judge: DEBRA J. YOUNG |
|
December 20, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #002) YOUNG (Motion Part) Judge: DEBRA J. YOUNG |
|
December 20, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #002) BRESLIN (Motion Part) Judge: THOMAS A. BRESLIN |
|
November 29, 2019 | Motion |
Reverse Decision (Motion #001) Decided: 01/06/2020WITHDRAWN - PER LETTER FROM PE Before Justice: DEBRA J. YOUNG Answer demanded: No Judge: DEBRA J. YOUNG |
|
November 29, 2019 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) YOUNG (Motion Part) Judge: DEBRA J. YOUNG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.