Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case in the jurisdiction of Albany County, NY, . Albany County, NY Superior Courts with DEBRA J. YOUNG presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDEBRA J. YOUNG Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 05, 2020 |
CategoryArticle 78 |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationAlbany County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2021 | Hearing |
PRE-DECIDED YOUNG (Court Activity) Judge: DEBRA J. YOUNG |
|
January 27, 2021 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) YOUNG (Motion Part) Judge: DEBRA J. YOUNG |
|
January 22, 2021 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) SILVERMAN (Motion Part) Judge: ADAM W. SILVERMAN |
|
December 11, 2020 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE YOUNG (Prelim. Conference) Judge: DEBRA J. YOUNG |
|
December 11, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) MCDONOUGH (Motion Part) Judge: ROGER D. MCDONOUGH |
|
December 11, 2020 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #001) ANNOUNCED (Motion) Judge: TO BE ANNOUNCED |
|
November 05, 2020 | Motion |
Vacate Decision (Motion #001) Decided: 01/27/2021DISMISSED Before Justice: DEBRA J. YOUNG Answer demanded: No Judge: DEBRA J. YOUNG |
|
November 05, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) YOUNG (Motion Part) Judge: DEBRA J. YOUNG |
|
November 05, 2020 | Motion |
Vacate Decision (Motion #001) Answer demanded: No |
|
November 05, 2020 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) ANNOUNCED (Motion) Judge: TO BE ANNOUNCED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.